The Uniqueness of Figures 6 and 9 You Do not Know!

Number 666…666 uniqueness, the uniqueness of the number 6:

1 + 2 + 3 + 4 + 5 + 6 = 21
1 + 2 + 3 + …….+ 66 = 2211
1 + 2 + 3 + …….+ 666 = 222111
1 + 2 + 3 + …….+ 6666 = 22221111
1 + 2 + 3 + …….+ 66666 = 2222211111
1 + 2 + 3 + …….+ 666666 = 222222111111

Now try to illustrate the answers to these questions.

1 + 2 + 3 + …+ n = 222…222111…111 (Lots of numbers 2 and 1 respectively in 2009 digits)
Determine the value of n

In mathematics, there are some unique things from the number 666:

* Is a palindrome number (symmetric): 666
* Represents the sum of 62 = 36 the first number ie 1 +2 +3 +4 .. …. +35 +36 = 666
* Total number of prime numbers up to 666 121 numbers which is the square of 11.

* 6 = (32) – (22) + 1
* 66 = (34) – (24) + 1
* 666 = (36) – (26) + 1
* The total of the amount of the first seven prime numbers squared ie: 22 + 32 + 52 + 72 + 112 + 132 + 666 172 =
* In Roman numerals, 666 is represented as DCLXVI (D = 500, C = 100, L = 50, X = 10, V = 5, I = 1). DIC LVX merupaan representation of dicit lux. Dicit lux then known as the voice of light with numbers diidentikan devil.

How about the number nine, number nine turned out so many secrets, follows its derived.

Try search results from 63 x 99.

How do we solve it?

One way to calculate the 63 x 99 is the multiplicative composite. However, there are other ways to calculate the product of two numbers, are as follows:

Because 99 = 100-1,

So 63 x 99 = 63 (100-1)
= 63. 100-63. 1
= 6300-63
= 6237

To multiply 999 x 27 can be completed as follows:

Because 999 = 1000-1
So 999 x 27 = (1000-1) x 27
= 2700-27
= 26 973

Furthermore, how is the result of eg 52 x 999? Try doing this with such techniques.
If the description, examples and problems above have been understood, then we will exploit the uniqueness of the other nine digits.

In integer division by the number 9, there are things that are very unique. Let us look at an example.

Example 1:

If 12 divided by 9, then the result is 1 and the remaining third.

If the numbers at 12, ie one and two added together then the result is 1 + 2 = 3 (the rest of the division by 9).

Example 2:

If 78 divided by 9, then the result is 8 and the remainder is 6.

If the numbers at 78, namely 7 and 8 are added then the result is 7 + 8 = 15. Furthermore, if the numbers at 15, ie 1 and 5 are added then the result is 1 + 5 = 6 (the rest of the division by 9).

Example 3:

If 878 is divided by 9, then the result is 97 and the remainder is 5.

If the numbers at 878, ie 8, 7 and 8 are added then the result is 8 + 7 + 8 = 23. Furthermore, if the numbers at 23, ie two and three added together then the result is 2 + 3 = 5 (the rest of the division by 9).

From these examples it can be concluded “Every integer is divided by 9, then the rest is the sum of the numbers over and over that there is a number that is divided on it until obtaining a number from 0 to 8”.

Another fascinating properties of the number nine can be seen from the product of fruit number 12,345,679 with nine original numbers of the first multiple of 9 as follows:

12345679 x 9 = 111 111 111

12345679 x 18 = 222 222 222

12345679 x 27 = 333 333 333

12345679 x 36 = 444 444 444

12345679 x 45 = 555,555,555

12345679 x 54 = 666 666 666

12345679 x 63 = 777 777 777

12345679 x 72 = 888 888 888

12345679 x 81 = 999 999 999

Now try your own, on the other privileges of the number 9, by making the number 123 456 789 times with nine original numbers of the first multiple of nine. Is there anything interesting from the results of these times?

List the product number 987654321 with nine original numbers multiples of nine of the first looks like the following:

987654321 x 9 = 8888888889

987654321 x 18 = 17,777,777,778

987654321 x 27 = 26,666,666,667

987654321 x 36 = 35,555,555,556

987654321 x 45 = 44,444,444,445

987654321 x 54 = 53,333,333,334

987654321 x 63 = 62,222,222,223

987654321 x 72 = 71,111,111,112

987654321 x 81 = 80,000,000,001

Here are the results of the uniqueness of the number nine.
1 x 9 + 2 = 11

12 x 9 + 3 = 111

123 x 9 + 4 = 1111

1234 x 9 + 5 = 11 111

12345 x 9 + 6 = 111 111

123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111

1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11,111,111

12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111 111 111

It also:

9 x 9 + 7 = 88

98 x 9 + 6 = 888

987 x 9 + 5 = 8888

9876 x 9 + 4 = 88 888

98765 x 9 + 3 = 888 888

987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888

9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88,888,888

98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888 888 888

One
0 x 9 + 0 = 0
1 x 9 + 1 = 10
12 x 9 + 2 = 110
123 x 9 + 3 = 1110
1234 x 9 + 4 = 11 110
12345 x 9 + 5 = 111 110
123456 x 9 + 6 = 1.11111 million
1234567 x 9 + 7 = 11.11111 million
12345678 x 9 + 8 = 111 111 110
123456789 x 9 + 9 = 1111111110

Two
1 x 1 = 1
11 x 11 = 121
111 x 111 = 12 321
1111 x 1111 = 1234321
11111 x 11111 = 123454321
111 111 x 111 111 = 12,345,654,321
1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321
11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321
111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

Three
1 x 8 + 1 = 9
12 x 8 + 2 = 98
123 x 8 + 3 = 987
1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876
12345 x 8 + 5 = 98 765
123456 x 8 + 6 = 987 654
1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543
12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98,765,432
123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987 654 321

Four
1 x 18 + 1 = 19
18 + 12 x 2 = 218
123 x 18 + 3 = 2217
1234 x 18 + 4 = 22 216
12345 x 18 + 5 = 222 215
123456 x 18 + 6 = 2222214
1234567 x 18 + 7 = 22,222,213
12345678 x 18 + 8 = 222 222 212
123456789 x 18 + 9 = 2222222211

Five
123456789 + 987654321 = 1111111110
1 x 142 857 = 142 857 (same numbers)
2 x 142 857 = 285 714 (each different sequence numbers)
3 x 142 857 = 428 571 (each different sequence numbers)
4 x 142 857 = 571 428 (each different sequence numbers)
5 x 142 857 = 714 285 (each different sequence numbers)
6 x 142 857 = 857 142 (each different sequence numbers)
7 x 142 857 = 999 999 (the results are fantastic!)

Six
Arbitrary numbers can be multiplied by 9, then the numbers added up the results, then results = 9. Let us prove.
1 x 9 = 9
2 x 9 = 18, number 1 + 8 = 9
3 x 9 = 27, number 2 + 7 = 9
4 x 9 = 36, number 3 + 6 = 9
5 x 9 = 45, number 4 + 5 = 9
6 x 9 = 54, number 5 + 4 = 9
7 x 9 = 63, number 6 + 3 = 9
8 x 9 = 72, number 7 + 2 = 9
9 x 9 = 81, number 8 + 1 = 9
10 x 9 = 90, number 9 + 0 = 9, ff., Until infinity.

Seven
22 x 9 = 198,
how quickly the two x 9 = 18, then insert number 9 in the middle, so 198.
33 x 9 = 297
44 x 9 = 396
55 x 9 = 495
66 x 9 = 594
77 x 9 = 693
88 x 9 = 792
99 x 9 = 891

If the twin three-digit numbers, then stay tucked in the middle 99. We prove it!
222 x 9 = 1998, a quick way 2 x 9 = 18, tucked amid 99
333 x 9 = 2997
444 x 9 = 3996
555 x 9 = 4995

Unique is not it?

Advertisements
  1. No trackbacks yet.

Leave a Reply

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out / Change )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out / Change )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out / Change )

Google+ photo

You are commenting using your Google+ account. Log Out / Change )

Connecting to %s

%d bloggers like this: